Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Fagon

Deceased

Bishop of Vannes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1665¹Born
5 Apr 171146.2SelectedBishop of Lombez, France
16 Mar 171247.2ConfirmedBishop of Lombez, France
22 May 171247.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lombez, France
29 Aug 171954.6SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
20 Mar 172055.2ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
16 Feb 174277.1DiedBishop of Vannes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine Fagon
Bishop Antoine Fagon (born 1665, died ) Bishop of Vannes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 250, and Page 408
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1712, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast