Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Benoît-Marie Cardinal Langénieux

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1824BornVillefranche-sur-Saone
25 May 185025.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
21 Dec 185026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
26 Jun 187348.7SelectedBishop of Tarbes, France
25 Jul 187348.8ConfirmedBishop of Tarbes, France
28 Oct 187349.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes, France
17 Nov 187450.1SelectedArchbishop of Reims, France
21 Dec 187450.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Reims, France
7 Jun 188661.6Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 188762.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
1 Jan 190580.2DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Benoît-Marie Langénieux:
Cardinal Benoît-Marie Langénieux (born , died ) Archbishop of Reims

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
  • a cardinal for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 481, and Page 535
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 48
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Jun 1886

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013