Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Félix de Tassy

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Saône


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1641BornParis
17 Sep 167534.1SelectedBishop of Digne, France
19 Oct 167635.2ConfirmedBishop of Digne, France
6 Dec 167635.3Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
18 Jun 167735.9SelectedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
31 Jan 167836.5ConfirmedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
11 Nov 171170.3DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Félix de Tassy:
Bishop Henri-Félix de Tassy (born , died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Saône

  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 132, and Page 184
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015