Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arthus de Lionne, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China

Titular Bishop of Rosalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1655¹Born
Jan 168126.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
5 Feb 168732.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China
5 Feb 168732.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Rosalia
20 Oct 169641.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China
30 Nov 170045.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rosalia
2 Aug 171358.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Arthus de Lionne
Bishop Arthus de Lionne M.E.P. (born 1655, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopCanton
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 32.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
  • Assisted by:
    • Father Jean Mezzafalce
      Priest
    • Father Emmanuel Escabedo
      Priest
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 25
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 43, Number 2,830

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 3 Jun 2020

Quantcast