Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Le Gras

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1589Born
16 Sep 162435.2AppointedBishop of Soissons, France
17 Nov 162435.4Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons, France
28 Oct 165667.4DiedBishop of Soissons, France

MicroData Summary for Simon Le Gras
Bishop Simon Le Gras (born , died ) Bishop of Soissons

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 324
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,624, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast