Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Nesmond

Deceased

Bishop of Bayeux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1629Born
22 Feb 166131.4SelectedBishop of Bayeux, France
8 Aug 166131.9ConfirmedBishop of Bayeux, France
19 Mar 166232.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bayeux, France
16 May 171585.7DiedBishop of Bayeux, France

MicroData Summary for François de Nesmond
Bishop François de Nesmond (born , died ) Bishop of Bayeux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 53.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 108
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1662, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017