Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurent Marie Bernard Dognin

Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1953 Born
10 Jun 197926.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Nanterre, France
15 Jun 198027.4Ordained PriestPriest of Nanterre, France
5 Jan 201158.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
5 Jan 201158.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Macriana in Mauretania
27 Feb 201158.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macriana in Mauretania
20 May 201562.3AppointedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
3 Jul 201562.5InstalledBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France

MicroData Summary for Laurent Marie Bernard Dognin
Bishop Laurent Marie Bernard Dognin (born ) Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis
Ordained DeaconSainte-Geneviève-Saint-Maurice, Cathedral, Nanterre, Diocese of Nanterre
Ordained PriestSaint-Justin, Church, Levallois-Perret, Diocese of Nanterre
Ordained BishopSaint-André, Cathedral, Bordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux (-Bazas)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,962
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 May 2015
  • i: CB, 20 May 2015
  • i: CB, 29 Jul 2015
  • od/c01: AJ, 25 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 26 May 2018

Quantcast