Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Habert de Montmort

Deceased

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644¹BornParis
1671¹27.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Nov 168036.8SelectedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
12 Jan 168238.0ConfirmedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
12 Apr 168238.2Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
23 Jan 169551.0DiedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Habert de Montmort:
Bishop Louis Habert de Montmort (born 1644, died ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

  • a priest for 24.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 20 Apr 2015