Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Étienne Poncher

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1446¹Born
15 Feb 150357.1AppointedBishop of Paris, France
Mar 1503³57.1Ordained BishopBishop of Paris, France
14 Mar 151973.2AppointedArchbishop of Sens, France
24 Feb 152579.1DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Étienne Poncher (VIAF: 233493311)
Archbishop Étienne Poncher (born 1446, died ) Archbishop of Sens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTours, Archdiocese of Tours

  • a bishop for 21.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 298
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1503, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 18 Apr 2018