Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Louis Touzé

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

Titular Bishop of Lebessus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1875BornSaint-Sauveur
29 Jun 190126.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 194368.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
22 Jun 194368.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lebessus
17 Aug 194368.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lebessus
6 Oct 195782.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
16 Nov 196085.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Paul-Louis Touzé:
Bishop Paul-Louis Touzé (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013