Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Non-Voting Cardinals


(Click on the column title to sort by that column)
BirthdateAgeElevatedNameCurrent Title
21 Sep 1935 18 Feb 2012Santos Cardinal Abril y CastellóArchpriest Emeritus of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
8 Jun 1938 20 Nov 2010Angelo Cardinal Amato, S.D.B.Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
18 Nov 1936 21 Oct 2003Ennio Cardinal AntonelliPresident Emeritus of the Dicastery for the Laity, the Family and Life
1 Nov 1932 25 May 1985Francis Cardinal ArinzePrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
1 May 1940 28 Nov 2020Felipe Cardinal Arizmendi EsquivelBishop Emeritus of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas, México
15 Feb 1937 20 Nov 2010Raymundo Cardinal Damasceno AssisArchbishop Emeritus of Aparecida, Sao Paulo, Brazil
1 Feb 1937 21 Feb 2001Audrys Juozas Cardinal BačkisArchbishop Emeritus of Vilnius, Lithuania
14 Jan 1943 24 Nov 2007Angelo Cardinal BagnascoArchbishop Emeritus of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
29 Sep 1940 22 Feb 2014Lorenzo Cardinal BaldisseriSecretary General Emeritus of the Synod of Bishops
12 Feb 1944 28 Jun 2018Pedro Ricardo Cardinal Barreto Jimeno, S.J.Archbishop Emeritus of Huancayo, Peru
7 Apr 1942 22 Feb 2014Gualtiero Cardinal BassettiArchbishop Emeritus of Perugia-Città della Pieve, Italy
2 Jun 1948 28 Jun 2018Giovanni Angelo Cardinal BecciuPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
1 Oct 1942 18 Feb 2012Giuseppe Cardinal BertelloPresident Emeritus of the Governatorate of Vatican City State
2 Dec 1934 21 Oct 2003Tarcisio Pietro Evasio Cardinal Bertone, S.D.B.Secretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State
13 Apr 1942 14 Feb 2015Ricardo Cardinal Blázquez PérezArchbishop Emeritus of Valladolid, Spain
17 May 1938 28 Jun 2018Aquilino Cardinal Bocos Merino, C.M.F.Superior General Emeritus of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
16 Aug 1939 24 Nov 2007Seán Baptist Cardinal BradyArchbishop Emeritus of Armagh, Ireland
5 Jan 1929 20 Nov 2010Walter Cardinal BrandmüllerPresident Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other
3 Feb 1943 18 Feb 2012Domenico Cardinal CalcagnoPresident Emeritus of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
22 Jul 1934 28 Nov 2020Raniero Cardinal Cantalamessa, O.F.M. Cap.Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine
28 Dec 1943 21 Feb 2001Juan Luis Cardinal Cipriani ThorneArchbishop Emeritus of Lima, Peru
6 Mar 1938 18 Feb 2012Francesco Cardinal CoccopalmerioPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts
17 Sep 1943 24 Nov 2007Angelo Cardinal ComastriPresident Emeritus of the Fabric of St. Peter
5 Sep 1934 24 Nov 2007Paul Josef Cardinal CordesPresident Emeritus of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development
16 May 1939 5 Oct 2019Eugenio Cardinal Dal Corso, P.S.D.P.Bishop Emeritus of Benguela, Angola
20 Dec 1934 26 Nov 1994Julius Riyadi Cardinal Darmaatmadja, S.J.Archbishop Emeritus of Jakarta, Indonesia
6 Sep 1930 21 Feb 1998Salvatore Cardinal De GiorgiArchbishop Emeritus of Palermo, Italy
1 Mar 1925 2 Feb 1983Alexandre Cardinal do NascimentoArchbishop Emeritus of Luanda, Angola
17 Apr 1927 30 Sep 2023Luis Pascual Cardinal Dri, O.F.M. Cap.Priest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1 Oct 1943 19 Nov 2016Patrick Cardinal D’Rozario, C.S.C.Archbishop Emeritus of Dhaka, Bangladesh
26 Apr 1943 18 Feb 2012Dominik Jaroslav Cardinal Duka, O.P.Archbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}, Czechia
27 Apr 1939 24 Mar 2006Stanisław Cardinal DziwiszArchbishop Emeritus of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
5 Sep 1933 21 Feb 2001Francisco Javier Cardinal Errázuriz Ossa, P. SchönstattArchbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile
7 Jan 1942 22 Feb 2014Ricardo Cardinal Ezzati Andrello, S.D.B.Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile
24 Sep 1933 24 Nov 2007Raffaele Cardinal Farina, S.D.B.Archivist Emeritus of the Vatican Secret Archive
15 Feb 1933 22 Feb 2014Kelvin Edward Cardinal FelixArchbishop Emeritus of Castries, Saint Lucia, Antilles
27 Aug 1940 28 Nov 2020Enrico Cardinal FerociCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria del Divino Amore a Castel di Leva
17 Aug 1937 5 Oct 2019Michael Louis Cardinal Fitzgerald, M. Afr.Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Egypt, Arab Republic of
6 Feb 1942 27 Aug 2022Fortunato Cardinal FrezzaCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
5 Jul 1942 27 Aug 2022Gianfranco Cardinal Ghirlanda, S.J.Cardinal-Deacon of Santissimo Nome di Gesù
31 Mar 1930 21 Oct 2003Julián Cardinal Herranz CasadoPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts
29 Mar 1942 27 Aug 2022Jorge Enrique Cardinal Jiménez Carvajal, C.I.M.Archbishop Emeritus of Cartagena, Colombia
7 Feb 1926 24 Nov 2007Estanislao Esteban Cardinal KarlicArchbishop Emeritus of Paraná, Argentina
5 Mar 1933 21 Feb 2001Walter Cardinal KasperPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
25 Jan 1929 2 Feb 1983Michael Michai Cardinal KitbunchuArchbishop Emeritus of Bangkok, Thailand
3 Jan 1935 24 Nov 2007Giovanni Cardinal LajoloPresident Emeritus of the Governatorate of Vatican City State
27 Oct 1927 14 Feb 2015Júlio Duarte Cardinal LangaBishop Emeritus of Xai-Xai, Mozambique
31 Oct 1936 28 Jun 1991Nicolás de Jesús Cardinal López RodríguezArchbishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
27 Feb 1936 28 Jun 1991Roger Michael Cardinal MahonyArchbishop Emeritus of Los Angeles, California, USA
18 Mar 1930 26 Nov 1994Adam Joseph Cardinal MaidaArchbishop Emeritus of Detroit, Michigan, USA
28 Aug 1940 30 Sep 2023Agostino Cardinal MarchettoSecretary Emeritus of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development
29 Apr 1937 24 Nov 2007Lluís Cardinal Martínez SistachArchbishop Emeritus of Barcelona, Spain
23 Nov 1932 21 Oct 2003Renato Raffaele Cardinal MartinoPresident Emeritus of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development
14 Oct 1939 14 Feb 2015Edoardo Cardinal MenichelliArchbishop Emeritus of Ancona-Osimo, Italy
18 Jul 1942 27 Aug 2022Arrigo Cardinal MiglioArchbishop Emeritus of Cagliari, Italy
29 Mar 1938 18 Feb 2012Manuel Cardinal Monteiro de CastroMajor Penitentiary Emeritus of the Apostolic Penitentiary
28 May 1934 20 Nov 2010Francesco Cardinal MonterisiArchpriest Emeritus of the Basilica di San Paolo fuori le Mura {Saint Paul Outside-the-Walls Basilica}
23 May 1931 18 Feb 2012Lucian Cardinal MureşanMajor Archbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
8 Mar 1941 21 Feb 2001Wilfrid Fox Cardinal Napier, O.F.M.Archbishop Emeritus of Durban, South Africa
1 Apr 1938 14 Feb 2015Pierre Cardinal Nguyễn Văn NhơnArchbishop Emeritus of Hà Nội, Viet Nam
8 Apr 1939 18 Feb 2012Edwin Frederick Cardinal O’BrienGrand Master Emeritus of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem
16 Jun 1936 21 Oct 2003Anthony Olubunmi Cardinal OkogieArchbishop Emeritus of Lagos, Nigeria
29 Jan 1944 24 Nov 2012John Olorunfemi Cardinal OnaiyekanArchbishop Emeritus of Abuja, Nigeria
17 May 1939 30 Sep 2023Diego Rafael Cardinal Padrón SánchezArchbishop Emeritus of Cumaná, Venezuela
5 Mar 1934 21 Oct 2003Jean-Baptiste Cardinal Phạm Minh MẫnArchbishop Emeritus of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
19 Jul 1941 19 Nov 2016Maurice Evenor Cardinal Piat, C.S.Sp.Bishop Emeritus of Port-Louis, Mauritius
23 May 1937 28 Jun 2018Toribio Sergio Cardinal Porco TiconaPrelate Emeritus of Corocoro, Bolivia
30 Aug 1930 25 May 1985Paul Joseph Jean Cardinal PoupardPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Culture
14 Nov 1930 21 Feb 1998Jānis Cardinal PujatsArchbishop Emeritus of Riga, Latvia
11 Mar 1939 22 Feb 2014Orlando Beltran Cardinal Quevedo, O.M.I.Archbishop Emeritus of Cotabato, Philippines
25 Feb 1940 24 Nov 2012Béchara Boutros Cardinal Raï, O.M.M.Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
18 Oct 1942 20 Nov 2010Gianfranco Cardinal RavasiPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission for Sacred Archeology
30 Jan 1934 21 Feb 2001Giovanni Battista Cardinal ReDean of the College of Cardinals
19 Apr 1935 21 Oct 2003Justin Francis Cardinal RigaliArchbishop Emeritus of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
6 Jun 1942 21 Feb 1998Norberto Cardinal Rivera CarreraArchbishop Emeritus of México, Federal District
23 Sep 1934 24 Mar 2006Franc Cardinal Rodé, C.M.Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
29 Dec 1942 21 Feb 2001Óscar Andrés Cardinal Rodríguez Maradiaga, S.D.B.Archbishop Emeritus of Tegucigalpa, Honduras
20 Feb 1938 20 Nov 2010Paolo Cardinal RomeoArchbishop Emeritus of Palermo, Italy
3 Sep 1942 28 Jun 2017Gregorio Cardinal Rosa ChávezAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Salvador, El Salvador
10 Aug 1932 24 Mar 2006Gaudencio Borbon Cardinal RosalesArchbishop Emeritus of Manila, Philippines
20 Aug 1936 21 Feb 1998Antonio María Cardinal Rouco VarelaArchbishop Emeritus of Madrid, Spain
13 Sep 1932 21 Feb 2001Pedro Cardinal Rubiano SàenzArchbishop Emeritus of Bogotá, Colombia
19 Feb 1931 28 Jun 1991Camillo Cardinal RuiniVicar General Emeritus of Roma {Rome}, Italy
22 Sep 1942 24 Nov 2012Rubén Cardinal Salazar GómezArchbishop Emeritus of Bogotá, Colombia
28 Mar 1933 26 Nov 1994Juan Cardinal Sandoval ÍñiguezArchbishop Emeritus of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
18 Nov 1943 24 Nov 2007Leonardo Cardinal SandriPrefect Emeritus of the Dicastery for the Eastern Churches
6 Jan 1932 21 Feb 2001José Cardinal Saraiva Martins, C.M.F.Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
28 Nov 1936 24 Nov 2007Théodore-Adrien Cardinal SarrArchbishop Emeritus of Dakar, Senegal
7 Nov 1941 21 Oct 2003Angelo Cardinal ScolaArchbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}, Italy
2 Jun 1943 21 Feb 2001Crescenzio Cardinal SepeArchbishop Emeritus of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
18 Oct 1928 19 Nov 2016Ernest Cardinal SimoniPriest of Shkodrë-Pult, Albania
26 Jul 1932 21 Feb 1998James Francis Cardinal StaffordMajor Penitentiary Emeritus of the Apostolic Penitentiary
18 Aug 1941 22 Feb 2014Beniamino Cardinal StellaPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Clergy
30 Jan 1939 14 Feb 2015Alberto Cardinal Suárez IndaArchbishop Emeritus of Morelia, Michoacán, México
7 Nov 1938 5 Oct 2019Sigitas Cardinal Tamkevičius, S.J.Archbishop Emeritus of Kaunas, Lithuania
12 Oct 1940 28 Nov 2020Silvano Maria Cardinal Tomasi, C.S.Permanent Observer Emeritus to United Nations Office and Specialized Agencies in Geneva
31 Jul 1939 18 Feb 2012John Cardinal Tong HonBishop Emeritus of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
17 Apr 1940 24 Mar 2006Agostino Cardinal ValliniVicar General Emeritus of Roma {Rome}, Italy
3 Feb 1938 18 Feb 2012Antonio Maria Cardinal VegliòPresident Emeritus of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development
30 Jul 1943 18 Feb 2012Giuseppe Cardinal VersaldiPrefect Emeritus of the Dicastery for Culture and Education
11 Oct 1934 14 Feb 2015Luis Héctor Cardinal VillalbaArchbishop Emeritus of Tucumán, Argentina
7 Nov 1942 24 Nov 2007André Armand Cardinal Vingt-TroisArchbishop Emeritus of Paris, France
15 Dec 1926 26 Nov 1994Emmanuel Cardinal WamalaArchbishop Emeritus of Kampala, Uganda
20 Feb 1928 25 May 1985Friedrich Cardinal WetterArchbishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
12 Nov 1940 20 Nov 2010Donald William Cardinal WuerlArchbishop Emeritus of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
5 Dec 1943 22 Feb 2014Andrew Cardinal Yeom Soo-jungArchbishop Emeritus of Seoul, Korea (South)
13 Jan 1932 24 Mar 2006Joseph Cardinal Zen Ze-kiun, S.D.B.Bishop Emeritus of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
27 Dec 1943 28 Jun 2017Jean Cardinal ZerboArchbishop of Bamako, Mali
27 Feb 1941 21 Oct 2003Gabriel Cardinal Zubeir WakoArchbishop Emeritus of Khartoum, Sudan
Note: 109 non-voting Cardinals of 239 living Cardinals. This table was last updated on 23 Feb 2024.

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 23 Feb 2024