Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Maurice Marie Joseph Christory, Comm. l'Emm.

Bishop of Chartres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1958 Born
22 Jun 199133.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
27 Jun 199234.3Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
2 Feb 201859.9AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
15 Apr 201860.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Philippe Maurice Marie Joseph Christory
Bishop Philippe Maurice Marie Joseph Christory Comm. l'Emm. (born ) Bishop of Chartres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTourcoing, Archdiocese of Lille
Ordained DeaconSt-François-Xavier, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Chartres, Diocese of Chartres

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chartres.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2018
  • ob: CB, 2 Feb 2018
  • c2+: CB, 6 Mar 2018
  • c23: CB, 16 Mar 2018
  • mn: AJ, 22 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,761
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast