Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guy de Sève de Rochechouart

Deceased

Bishop of Arras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1640BornParis
20 Mar 166625.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 167030.1AppointedBishop of Arras, France
30 Nov 167030.4Ordained BishopBishop of Arras, France
27 Dec 172484.5DiedBishop of Arras, France

MicroData Summary for Guy de Sève de Rochechouart:
Bishop Guy de Sève de Rochechouart (born , died ) Bishop of Arras

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 54.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015