Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Arnauld

Deceased

Bishop of Angers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1597BornParis
4 Apr 165052.4AppointedBishop of Angers, France
29 Jun 165052.7Ordained BishopBishop of Angers, France
8 Jun 169294.6DiedBishop of Angers, France

MicroData Summary for Henri Arnauld:
Bishop Henri Arnauld (born , died ) Bishop of Angers

  • a bishop for 41.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013