Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Juvénal des Ursins

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1388Born
29 Jan 143243.3AppointedBishop of Beauvais, France
24 Mar 143243.5Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais, France
3 Apr 144455.5AppointedBishop of Laon, France
3 Mar 144960.4AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
14 Jul 147384.8DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Juvénal des Ursins
Archbishop Jean Juvénal des Ursins (born , died ) Archbishop of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris
Ordained BishopOrsini palace, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceReims, Archdiocese of Reims

  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 173, and Page 222
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 104
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 2,744
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,651

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 24 Aug 2018

Quantcast