Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre de Jouanne de Saumery

Deceased

Bishop of Rieux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1686¹BornParis
15 Dec 171832.9SelectedBishop of Rieux, France
2 Oct 171933.7ConfirmedBishop of Rieux, France
17 Mar 172034.2Ordained BishopBishop of Rieux, France
27 Oct 174761.8DiedBishop of Rieux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexandre de Jouanne de Saumery:
Bishop Alexandre de Jouanne de Saumery (born 1686, died ) Bishop of Rieux

  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 334
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015