Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Popes

In Sequence


(Click on the column title to sort by that column)
#Papal
Name
Birth
Date
Conclave
Start
ElectedInstalledEnd of ReignLength
DateAgeDateAgeDateAgeElectedInstalled
266Francis17 Dec 193612 Mar 201313 Mar 201376.219 Mar 201376.2( Age: )
265Benedict XVI16 Apr 192718 Apr 200519 Apr 200578.024 Apr 200578.028 Feb 2013#85.87.87.8
264John Paul II18 May 192014 Oct 197816 Oct 197858.422 Oct 197858.42 Apr 200584.826.426.4
263John Paul I17 Oct 191225 Aug 197826 Aug 197865.83 Sep 197865.828 Sep 197865.9.0.0
262Paul VI26 Sep 189719 Jun 196321 Jun 196365.730 Jun 196365.76 Aug 197880.815.115.1
261John XXIII25 Nov 188125 Oct 195828 Oct 195876.94 Nov 195876.93 Jun 196381.54.54.5
260Pius XII2 Mar 18761 Mar 19392 Mar 193963.012 Mar 193963.09 Oct 195882.619.619.5
259Pius XI31 May 18572 Feb 19226 Feb 192264.612 Feb 192264.610 Feb 193981.617.016.9
258Benedict XV21 Nov 185431 Aug 19143 Sep 191459.76 Sep 191459.722 Jan 192267.17.37.3
257Pius X2 Jun 183531 Jul 19034 Aug 190368.19 Aug 190368.120 Aug 191479.211.011.0
256Leo XIII2 Mar 181018 Feb 187820 Feb 187867.93 Mar 187868.020 Jul 190393.325.425.3
255Pius IX13 May 179214 Jun 184616 Jun 184654.021 Jun 184654.17 Feb 187885.731.631.6
254Gregory XVI8 Sep 176514 Dec 18302 Feb 183165.46 Feb 1831*65.41 Jun 184680.715.315.3
253Pius VIII20 Nov 176124 Feb 182931 Mar 182967.35 Apr 182967.330 Nov 183069.01.61.6
252Leo XII22 Aug 17602 Sep 182328 Sep 182363.05 Oct 182363.110 Feb 182968.45.35.3
251Pius VII14 Aug 17421 Dec 179914 Mar 180057.521 Mar 180057.620 Aug 182381.023.423.4
250Pius VI25 Dec 17175 Oct 177415 Feb 177557.122 Feb 1775*57.129 Aug 179981.624.524.5
249Clement XIV31 Oct 170515 Feb 176919 May 176963.59 Jun 176963.622 Sep 177468.85.35.2
248Clement XIII7 Mar 169315 May 17586 Jul 175865.316 Jul 175865.32 Feb 176975.910.510.5
247Benedict XIV31 Mar 167518 Feb 174017 Aug 174065.322 Aug 174065.33 May 175883.017.717.6
246Clement XII7 Apr 16525 Mar 173012 Jul 173078.216 Jul 173078.26 Feb 174087.89.59.5
245Benedict XIII2 Feb 164920 Mar 172429 May 172475.34 Jun 172475.323 Feb 173081.05.75.7
244Innocent XIII13 May 165531 Mar 17218 May 172165.918 May 172166.07 Mar 172468.82.82.8
243Clement XI23 Jul 16499 Oct 170023 Nov 170051.38 Dec 170051.319 Mar 172171.620.320.2
242Innocent XII13 Mar 161512 Feb 169112 Jul 169176.315 Jul 169176.327 Sep 170085.59.29.1
241Alexander VIII22 Apr 161023 Aug 16896 Oct 168979.416 Oct 168979.41 Feb 169180.71.31.2
240Innocent XI19 May 16112 Aug 167621 Sep 167665.34 Oct 167665.312 Aug 168978.212.812.8
239Clement X12 Jul 159020 Dec 166929 Apr 167079.711 May 167079.822 Jul 167686.06.26.1
238Clement IX28 Jan 16002 Jun 166720 Jun 166767.326 Jun 166767.49 Dec 166969.82.42.4
237Alexander VII13 Feb 159918 Jan 16557 Apr 165556.118 Apr 165556.122 May 166768.212.112.0
236Innocent X6 May 15749 Aug 164415 Sep 164470.34 Oct 164470.47 Jan 165580.610.310.2
235Urban VIII5 Apr 156819 Jul 16236 Aug 162355.329 Sep 162355.429 Jul 164476.320.920.8
234Gregory XV9 Jan 15548 Feb 16219 Feb 162167.014 Feb 162167.08 Jul 162369.42.42.4
233Paul V17 Sep 15528 May 160516 May 160552.629 May 160552.628 Jan 162168.315.615.6
232Leo XI2 Jun 153514 Mar 16051 Apr 160569.810 Apr 160569.827 Apr 160569.9.0-.0
231Clement VIII24 Feb 153610 Jan 159230 Jan 159255.99 Feb 159255.93 Mar 160569.013.013.0
230Innocent IX20 Jul 151927 Oct 159129 Oct 159172.23 Nov 159172.230 Dec 159172.4.1.1
229Gregory XIV11 Feb 15358 Oct 15905 Dec 159055.88 Dec 159055.816 Oct 159156.6.8.8
228Urban VII4 Aug 15217 Sep 159015 Sep 159069.1N/AN/A27 Sep 159069.1-.0N/A
227Sixtus V13 Dec 152121 Apr 158524 Apr 158563.31 May 158563.327 Aug 159068.75.35.3
226Gregory XIII7 Jan 150212 May 157213 May 157270.325 May 157270.310 Apr 158583.212.912.8
225Pius V17 Jan 150420 Dec 15657 Jan 156661.917 Jan 156662.01 May 157268.26.36.2
224Pius IV31 Mar 14995 Sep 155925 Dec 155960.76 Jan 156060.79 Dec 156566.65.95.9
223Paul IV28 Jun 147615 May 155523 May 155578.926 May 155578.918 Aug 155983.14.24.2
222Marcellus II6 May 15015 Apr 15559 Apr 155553.910 Apr 1555*53.91 May 155553.9.0.0
221Julius III10 Sep 148729 Nov 15497 Feb 155062.422 Feb 155062.423 Mar 155567.55.15.0
220Paul III29 Feb 146811 Oct 153413 Oct 153466.63 Nov 153466.610 Nov 154981.615.015.0
219Clement VII26 May 14781 Oct 152319 Nov 152345.426 Nov 152345.525 Sep 153456.310.810.8
218Hadrian VI2 Mar 145927 Dec 15219 Jan 152262.831 Aug 152263.414 Sep 152364.51.61.0
217Leo X11 Dec 14754 Mar 151311 Mar 151337.219 Mar 151337.21 Dec 152145.98.78.7
216Julius II5 Dec 144331 Oct 15031 Nov 150359.926 Nov 150359.921 Feb 151369.29.39.2
215Pius III29 May 143916 Sep 150322 Sep 150364.38 Oct 150364.318 Oct 150364.3.0-.0
214Alexander VI 14316 Aug 149211 Aug 149261.626 Aug 149261.618 Aug 150372.611.010.9
213Innocent VIII 143226 Aug 148429 Aug 148452.612 Sep 148452.625 Jul 149260.57.97.8
212Sixtus IV21 Jul 14146 Aug 14719 Aug 147157.025 Aug 1471*57.012 Aug 148470.013.012.9
211Paul II23 Feb 141727 Aug 146430 Aug 146447.516 Sep 146447.526 Jul 147154.46.96.8
210Pius II18 Oct 140516 Aug 145819 Aug 145852.83 Sep 145852.814 Aug 146458.85.95.9
209Callistus III31 Dec 13784 Apr 14558 Apr 145576.220 Apr 145576.36 Aug 145879.53.33.2
208Nicholas V15 Nov 13974 Mar 14476 Mar 144749.319 Mar 144749.324 Mar 145557.38.08.0
207Eugene IV 13832 Mar 14313 Mar 143148.111 Mar 143148.123 Feb 144764.115.915.9
206Martin V 13688 Nov 141711 Nov 141749.821 Nov 141749.820 Feb 143163.113.213.2
205Gregory XII 132718 Nov 140630 Nov 140679.919 Dec 140679.94 Jul 1415#88.58.58.5
204Innocent VII 133610 Oct 140417 Oct 140468.711 Nov 140468.86 Nov 140670.82.01.9
203Boniface IX 13502 Nov 138939.89 Nov 1389*39.81 Oct 140454.714.914.8
202Urban VI 13188 Apr 137860.218 Apr 137860.215 Oct 138971.711.511.4
201Gregory XI 132930 Dec 137041.93 Jan 1371*42.027 Mar 137849.27.27.2
200Urban V 131028 Sep 136252.76 Nov 1362*52.819 Dec 137060.98.28.1
199Innocent VI 128218 Dec 135270.930 Dec 135270.912 Sep 136280.69.79.7
198Clement VI 12907 May 134252.319 May 134252.36 Dec 135262.910.510.5
197Benedict XII 128020 Dec 133454.98 Jan 133555.025 Apr 134262.37.37.2
196John XXII 12447 Aug 131672.55 Sep 131672.64 Dec 133490.918.318.2
195Clement V 12645 Jun 130541.414 Nov 1305*41.820 Apr 131450.38.88.4
194Benedict XI 124022 Oct 130363.827 Oct 130363.87 Jul 130464.5.7.6
193Boniface VIII 123024 Dec 129464.923 Jan 1295*65.011 Oct 130373.78.78.7
192Celestine V 12157 Jul 129479.529 Aug 1294*79.613 Dec 1294#79.9.4.2
191Nicholas IV30 Sep 122722 Feb 128860.325 Feb 128860.44 Apr 129264.54.14.1
190Honorius IV 12102 Apr 128575.220 May 1285*75.33 Apr 128777.22.01.8
189Martin IV 121022 Feb 128171.123 Mar 1281*71.228 Mar 128575.24.04.0
188Nicholas III 121025 Nov 127767.8Dec 1277*67.922 Aug 128070.62.72.7
187John XXI 12108 Sep 127666.620 Sep 127666.720 May 127767.3.6.6
186Hadrian V 121011 Jul 127666.5N/AN/A18 Aug 127666.6.1N/A
185Innocent V 122421 Jan 127652.022 Feb 127652.122 Jun 127652.4.4.3
184Gregory X 12101 Sep 127161.627 Mar 1272*62.210 Jan 127666.04.33.7
183Clement IV 11955 Feb 126570.022 Feb 126570.129 Nov 126873.93.83.7
182Urban IV 119529 Aug 126166.6N/AN/A2 Oct 126469.73.0N/A
181Alexander IV 118512 Dec 125469.920 Dec 125469.925 May 126176.36.46.4
180Innocent IV 119525 Jun 124348.428 Jun 1243*48.47 Dec 125459.911.411.4
179Celestine IVunknown25 Oct 1241N/AN/AN/A10 Nov 1241N/A-.0N/A
178Gregory IX 117019 Mar 122757.211 Apr 122757.222 Aug 124171.614.414.3
177Honorius III 115018 Jul 121666.524 Jul 1216*66.518 Mar 122777.210.610.6
176Innocent III 11608 Jan 119838.022 Feb 1198*38.116 Jul 121656.518.518.4
175Celestine III 110510 Apr 119186.214 Apr 1191*86.28 Jan 119893.06.76.7
174Clement III 113019 Dec 118757.97 Jan 118858.027 Mar 119161.23.23.2
173Gregory VIII 110521 Oct 118782.825 Oct 1187*82.817 Dec 118782.9.1.1
172Urban III 112025 Nov 118565.81 Dec 118565.920 Oct 118767.81.91.8
171Lucius III 11001 Sep 118181.66 Sep 118181.625 Nov 118585.84.24.2
170Alexander III 11007 Sep 115959.620 Sep 1159*59.730 Aug 118181.621.921.9
169Hadrian IV 11004 Dec 115454.95 Dec 115454.91 Sep 115959.64.74.7
168Anastasius IV 10738 Jul 115380.512 Jul 115380.53 Dec 115481.91.41.3
167Eugene III 108515 Feb 114560.118 Dec 1145*60.98 Jul 115368.58.37.5
166Lucius IIunknown9 Mar 1144N/A12 Mar 1144*N/A15 Feb 1145N/A.9.9
165Celestine IIunknown26 Sep 1143N/A3 Oct 1143*N/A8 Mar 1144N/A.4.4
164Innocent IIunknown14 Feb 1130N/A23 Feb 1130*N/A24 Sep 1143N/A13.613.5
163Honorius IIunknown15 Dec 1124N/A21 Dec 1124N/A13 Feb 1130N/A5.15.1
162Callistus IIunknown2 Feb 1119N/A9 Feb 1119N/A13 Dec 1124N/A5.85.8
161Gelasius II 106224 Jan 111856.010 Mar 1118*56.129 Jan 111957.01.0.8
160Paschal II 105013 Aug 109949.614 Aug 1099*49.621 Jan 111868.018.418.4
159Urban II 103512 Mar 108853.112 Mar 108853.129 Jul 109964.511.311.3
158Victor III 102624 May 108660.39 May 1087*61.316 Sep 108761.71.3.3
157Gregory VII 102022 Apr 107353.329 Jun 1073*53.425 May 108565.312.011.9
156Alexander IIunknown30 Sep 1061N/A1 Oct 1061N/A21 Apr 1073N/A11.511.5
155Nicholas II 9806 Dec 105878.924 Jan 105979.027 Jul 106181.52.62.5
154Stephen IX (X)
153Victor II
152Leo IX
151Damasus II
150Benedict IX
149Clement II
148Gregory VI
147Benedict IX
146Sylvester III
145Benedict IX
144John XIX
143Benedict VIII
142Sergius IV
141John XVIII
140John XVII
139Sylvester II
138Gregory V
137John XV
136John XIV
135Benedict VII
134Benedict VI
133John XIII
132Benedict V
131Leo VIII
130John XII
129Agapitus II
128Marinus II
127Stephen VIII
126Leo VII
125John XI
124Stephen VII
123Leo VI
122John X
121Lando
120Anastasius III
119Sergius III
118Leo V
117Benedict IV
116John IX
115Theodore II
114Romanus
113Stephen VI
112Boniface VI
111Formosus
110Stephen V
109Hadrian III
108Marinus I
107John VIII
106Hadrian II
105Nicholas I
104Benedict III
103Leo IV
102Sergius II
101Gregory IV
100Valentine
99Eugene II
98Paschal I
97Stephen IV
96Leo III
95Hadrian I
94Stephen III
93Paul
92Stephen II
91Zacharias
90Gregory III
89Gregory II
88Constantine
87Sisinius
86John VII
85John VI
84Sergius I
83Conon
82John V
81Benedict II
80Leo II
79Agatho
78Donus
77Adeodatus II
76Vitalian
75Eugene I
74Martin I
73Theodore I
72John IV
71Severinus
70Honorius I
69Boniface V
68Adeodatus I
67Boniface IV
66Boniface III
65Sabinian
64Gregory I
63Pelagius II
62Benedict I
61John III
60Pelagius I
59Vigilius
58Silverius
57Agapitus I
56John II
55Boniface II
54Felix IV
53John I
52Hormisdas
51Symmachus
50Anastasius II
49Gelasius I
48Felix III
47Simplicius
46Hilarus
45Leo I
44Sixtus III
43Celestine I
42Boniface I
41Zosimus
40Innocent I
39Anastasius I
38Siricius
37Damasus I
36Liberius
35Julius I
34Mark
33Sylvester I
32Miltiades
31Eusebius
30Marcellus I
29Marcellinus
28Gaius
27Eutychian
26Felix I
25Dionysius
24Sixtus II
23Stephen I
22Lucius I
21Cornelius
20Fabian
19Anterus
18Pontian
17Urban I
16Callistus
15Zephyrinus
14Victor I
13Eleutherius
12Soter
11Anicletus I
10Pius I
9Hyginus
8Telesphorus
7Sixtus I
6Alexander I
5Evaristus
4Clement I
3Cletus
2Linus
1Peter
Note: The above table is substantially incomplete at this time.
* indicates the Pope was not already a bishop at the time of his election, so the date is of his consecration.
# indicates the Pope resigned.
Popes listed: 266. This table was last updated on 18 Dec 2014.

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014