Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel-Jules Ravinet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Troyes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1801BornParis
28 May 182524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
15 Dec 186059.7SelectedBishop of Troyes, France
18 Mar 186159.9ConfirmedBishop of Troyes, France
1 May 186160.1Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
2 Aug 187574.3RetiredBishop of Troyes, France
28 Mar 188180.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Troyes, France

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel-Jules Ravinet:
Bishop Emmanuel-Jules Ravinet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Troyes

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 563

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013