Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Victor Le Bouthilier

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597BornParis
26 Dec 162630.0SelectedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
29 Nov 162730.9ConfirmedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
9 Apr 162831.3Ordained BishopBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
12 Dec 163033.9SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Tours, France
1 Sep 163134.7ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Tours, France
21 May 164144.4SucceededArchbishop of Tours, France
12 Sep 167073.7DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Victor Le Bouthilier:
Archbishop Victor Le Bouthilier (died ) Archbishop of Tours

  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013