Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Baptiste-Michel Colbert de Saint-Pouange

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1640¹BornParis
5 Oct 167030.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 167434.8SelectedBishop of Montauban, France
15 Jul 167535.5ConfirmedBishop of Montauban, France
28 Oct 167535.8Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France
15 Aug 168747.6SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
12 Oct 169353.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
11 Jul 171070.5DiedArchbishop of Toulouse, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Michel Colbert de Saint-Pouange:
Archbishop Jean-Baptiste-Michel Colbert de Saint-Pouange (born 1640, died ) Archbishop of Toulouse

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 273, and Page 378
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 30 Apr 2015