Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arthur Grange Riddell

Deceased

Bishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1836Born
24 Sep 185822.0Ordained PriestPriest of Beverley, England, Great Britain
27 Apr 188043.6AppointedBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
9 Jun 188043.7Ordained BishopBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
15 Sep 190771.0DiedBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Arthur Grange Riddell (VIAF: 305856781)
Bishop Arthur Grange Riddell (born , died ) Bishop of Northampton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSt. Cuthbert, Seminary, Ushaw, Durham, County Durham, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady Immaculate and St. Thomas of Canterbury, Cathedral, Northampton, Northamptonshire, Diocese of Northampton, England
Death PlaceBishop's House, Marriott Street, Northampton, Northamptonshire, Diocese of Northampton, England
Buried Place (Original)Kingsthorpe, Cemetery, Northampton, Northamptonshire, Diocese of Northampton, England
Buried Place (Current)Our Lady Immaculate and St. Thomas of Canterbury, Cathedral, Northampton, Northamptonshire, Diocese of Northampton, England

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 418
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 175
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 31
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast