Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean de Nanton

Deceased

Bishop of Paris, France


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Feb 1405AppointedArchbishop of Vienne, France
26 Jun 1423AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Paris, France
7 Oct 1426DiedBishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Nanton
Archbishop Jean de Nanton (died ) Bishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBourgogne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 391, and Page 527

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast