Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marie-Dominique-Auguste Sibour

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1792Born
14 Jun 181825.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 Oct 183947.1SelectedBishop of Digne, France
23 Dec 183947.3ConfirmedBishop of Digne, France
25 Feb 184047.5Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
14 Mar 184047.6InstalledBishop of Digne, France
24 Jul 184855.9SelectedArchbishop of Paris, France
11 Sep 184856.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Paris, France
3 Jan 185764.4DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Marie-Dominique-Auguste Sibour (VIAF: 17244619)
Archbishop Marie-Dominique-Auguste Sibour (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux
Ordained BishopCathedral St. Sauveur, Aix, Archdiocese of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 441
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 176
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016