Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Camille de Duranti de Lironcourt

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Bethleem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1733BornParis, France
24 Aug 177743.8SelectedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
30 Mar 177844.4ConfirmedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
26 Apr 177844.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethleem
15 Jul 180268.7DiedTitular Bishop of Bethleem

MicroData Summary for François-Camille de Duranti de Lironcourt:
Bishop François-Camille de Duranti de Lironcourt (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Bethleem

  • a bishop for 24.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015