Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-Baptiste Cardinal de Belloy-Morangle

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1709Born
19 Dec 173324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
3 Oct 175141.9SelectedBishop of Glandèves, France
20 Dec 175142.1ConfirmedBishop of Glandèves, France
30 Jan 175242.3Ordained BishopBishop of Glandèves, France
22 Jun 175545.7SelectedBishop of Marseille, France
4 Aug 175545.8ConfirmedBishop of Marseille, France
21 Sep 180191.9ResignedBishop of Marseille, France
9 Apr 180292.5SelectedArchbishop of Paris, France
10 Apr 180292.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Paris, France
17 Jan 180393.2Elevated to Cardinal
1 Feb 180595.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
10 Jun 180898.6DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste de Belloy-Morangle (VIAF: 27334194)
Jean-Baptiste Cardinal de Belloy-Morangle (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorangles

  • a priest for 74.4 years
  • a bishop for 56.3 years
  • a cardinal for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 299
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Jan 1803
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 226, and Page 280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast