Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert-Jacques-Victor Frossard

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

Titular Bishop of Tingaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1909BornParis
26 Mar 193929.9Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
30 Sep 196758.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
30 Sep 196758.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tingaria
6 Jan 196858.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tingaria
24 Mar 198474.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
13 Feb 198878.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Robert-Jacques-Victor Frossard:
Bishop Robert-Jacques-Victor Frossard (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013