Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Biard, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mopti, Mali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1924Born
1 Feb 195025.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
29 Sep 196439.8AppointedBishop of Mopti, Mali
2 Feb 196540.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mopti, Mali
12 Apr 198863.3ResignedBishop of Mopti, Mali
31 Oct 200378.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Mopti, Mali

MicroData Summary for Georges Biard
Bishop Georges Biard M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mopti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, France

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast