Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathias Poncet de la Rivière

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Troyes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1707¹BornParis
2 Apr 174235.2SelectedBishop of Troyes, France
9 Jul 174235.5ConfirmedBishop of Troyes, France
2 Sep 174235.6Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
28 Feb 175851.1ResignedBishop of Troyes, France
5 Aug 178073.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Troyes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mathias Poncet de la Rivière:
Bishop Mathias Poncet de la Rivière (born 1707, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Troyes

  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 413

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 24 Dec 2015