Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Albert Jean-Marie Rouet

Archbishop Emeritus of Poitiers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1936 Born
29 Jun 196226.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
23 Mar 196327.1Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
21 Jun 198650.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
21 Jun 198650.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Obbi
2 Sep 198650.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obbi
16 Dec 199357.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Poitiers, France
12 Jun 199458.3SucceededBishop of Poitiers, France
8 Dec 200266.8AppointedArchbishop of Poitiers, France
12 Feb 201175.0RetiredArchbishop of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for Albert Jean-Marie Rouet (VIAF: 105631717)
Archbishop Albert Jean-Marie Rouet (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Poitiers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThenay, Archdiocese of Bourges
Ordained DeaconSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestBossuet Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Poitiers.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jul 2018

Quantcast