Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Marie Henri Legrez, O.P.

Archbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1948 BornParis
196819.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
27 Jun 197628.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Aug 200557.2AppointedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
23 Oct 200557.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Claude, France
2 Feb 201162.7AppointedArchbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
3 Apr 201162.8InstalledArchbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France

MicroData Summary for Jean Marie Henri Legrez:
Archbishop Jean Marie Henri Legrez O.P. (born ) Archbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Aug 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,004
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013