Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Armand-Jules de Rohan-Guémené

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1695Born
2 Jun 172227.3SelectedArchbishop of Reims, France
6 Jul 172227.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Reims, France
23 Aug 172227.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Reims, France
28 Aug 176267.5DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Armand-Jules de Rohan-Guémené
Archbishop Armand-Jules de Rohan-Guémené (born , died ) Archbishop of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast