Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Pierre Louis Marie de Romanet de Beaune

Bishop of France, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1962 Born
24 Sep 199431.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
24 Jun 199532.6Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
28 Jun 201754.6AppointedBishop of France, Military
10 Sep 201754.8Ordained BishopBishop of France, Military

MicroData Summary for Antoine Pierre Louis Marie de Romanet de Beaune (VIAF: 197846563)
Bishop Antoine Pierre Louis Marie de Romanet de Beaune (born ) Bishop of France, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Mans, Diocese of Le Mans
Ordained DeaconNotre-Dame de Grâce de Passy, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of France, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2017
  • ob: CB, 28 Jun 2017
  • c2+: CB, 27 Jul 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,522
  • mn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c1: AJ, 25 May 2018
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jul 2018

Quantcast