Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jean Romary

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Paris, France

Titular Bishop of Acelum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1930Born
9 Oct 195626.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
29 Jun 195727.1Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
13 Jul 197646.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
13 Jul 197646.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Acelum
21 Oct 197646.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Romary
Father Jean Romary (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVitry-sur-Seine, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconSeminary St-Sulpice, Chapel, Issy-les-Moulineaux, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 19.3 years

Source(s):
  • od/op/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jul 2018

Quantcast