Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie-Clément Badré

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1913Born
23 Dec 193926.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
24 Dec 193926.1Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
22 Jun 196450.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
22 Jun 196450.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Proconsulari
3 Sep 196450.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Proconsulari
15 Apr 196753.4AppointedBishop of France, Military
10 Dec 196956.1AppointedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
19 Nov 198875.0RetiredBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
17 Sep 200187.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie-Clément Badré (VIAF: 89376859)
Bishop Jean-Marie-Clément Badré (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bayeux (-Lisieux)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArbois, Diocese of Saint-Claude
Ordained DeaconSacré-Cœur of Montmartre, Basilica, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSacré-Cœur of Montmartre, Basilica, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSaint-Louis des Invalides, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Bayeux, Diocese of Bayeux (-Lisieux)

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 Jul 2018

Quantcast