Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas-Joseph de Paris

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1680BornParis
10 Feb 172342.8SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Orléans, France
22 Nov 172343.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Orléans, France
22 Nov 172343.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Europus
27 Feb 172443.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Europus
9 Jun 173353.1SucceededBishop of Orléans, France
10 Jan 175473.7ResignedBishop of Orléans, France
4 Jun 175777.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas-Joseph de Paris:
Bishop Nicolas-Joseph de Paris (born , died ) Bishop of Orléans

  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 106, and Page 197
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015