Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Auvry

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Coutances, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606¹Born
3 Dec 164640.9AppointedBishop of Coutances, France
15 Feb 164741.1Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
Sep 1658³52.6ResignedBishop of Coutances, France
9 Jul 168781.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Coutances, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude Auvry
Bishop Claude Auvry (born 1606, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Coutances

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 161
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1647, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast