Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Didier de Saint Martin, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan)

Bishop of Corada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1743BornParis, France
4 Apr 176724.2Ordained PriestPriest
177228.9ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
15 Jan 178238.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan), China
15 Jan 178238.9AppointedBishop of Corada
13 Jun 178441.4Ordained BishopBishop of Corada
28 Sep 179249.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan), China
15 Nov 180158.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan), China

MicroData Summary for Jean-Didier de Saint Martin: VIAF:64954284
Bishop Jean-Didier de Saint Martin M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan)

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 147, and Page 455
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016