Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal de Gondi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Paris, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1532¹Born
156634.0SelectedBishop of Langres, France
15 May 156634.3ConfirmedBishop of Langres, France
19 May 156634.3Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
8 May 156836.3SelectedBishop of Paris, France
14 Dec 156937.9ConfirmedBishop of Paris, France
18 Dec 158755.9Elevated to Cardinal
23 May 158856.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
16 Jun 159765.4ResignedBishop of Paris, France
17 Feb 161684.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Paris, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Gondi (VIAF: 17298749)
Pierre Cardinal de Gondi (born 1532, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon
Ordained BishopSs. Cosmo e Damiano, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Notre Dame des Sept Douleurs Chapel, Cathedral, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 49.7 years
  • a cardinal for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1587
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 226, and Page 270
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 9, Number 14
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast