Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Édouard Valot

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nevers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1637Born
8 Sep 166629.6AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
28 Aug 166730.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nevers, France
Feb 170568.0ResignedBishop of Nevers, France
3 Sep 170568.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Nevers, France

MicroData Summary for Édouard Valot:
Bishop Édouard Valot (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nevers

  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015