Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Denis-François Bouthillier de Chavigny

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1665BornParis
22 Mar 169226.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 169731.8SelectedBishop of Troyes, France
10 Mar 169832.7ConfirmedBishop of Troyes, France
20 Apr 169832.8Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
21 Jan 171650.6SelectedArchbishop of Sens, France
11 May 171852.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Sens, France
9 Nov 173065.4DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

MicroData Summary for Denis-François Bouthillier de Chavigny:
Archbishop Denis-François Bouthillier de Chavigny (born , died ) Archbishop of Sens

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 354, and Page 387

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013