Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gabriel Sortais, O.C.S.O. †

Deceased

Abbot General of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1902Born
20 Aug 192623.9ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
20 Aug 192926.9Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
29 Jun 193128.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
7 Nov 195149.1AppointedAbbot General of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
13 Nov 196361.1DiedAbbot General of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Sortais
Father Gabriel Sortais O.C.S.O. (born , died ) Abbot General of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBellevue, France

  • a priest for 32.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 7 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast