Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Colbert de Saint-Pouange

Deceased

Bishop of Mâcon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629¹Born
11 Oct 166637.7AppointedBishop of Mâcon, France
12 Dec 166637.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mâcon, France
28 Nov 167647.9DiedBishop of Mâcon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel Colbert de Saint-Pouange
Bishop Michel Colbert de Saint-Pouange (born 1629, died ) Bishop of Mâcon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast