Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hubert Louis Marie Félix Michon

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rabat, Morocco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1927Born
29 Jun 195629.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Rabat, Morocco
20 Apr 195729.8Ordained PriestPriest of Rabat, Morocco
2 May 198355.9AppointedArchbishop of Rabat, Morocco
11 Dec 198356.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rabat, Morocco
5 May 200173.9ResignedArchbishop of Rabat, Morocco
20 May 200476.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rabat, Morocco

MicroData Summary for Hubert Louis Marie Félix Michon
Archbishop Hubert Louis Marie Félix Michon (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rabat

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained DeaconSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Rabat, Archdiocese of Rabat
Death PlaceLe Chesnay, Diocese of Versailles, France

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 9 Jul 2018

Quantcast