Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Philippe Paul Nault, S.J.M.V.

Bishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France

Note/Previous Titular See: (Société Jean-Marie Vianney)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1965 Born
5 Jul 199833.2Ordained PriestPriest of Belley-Ars, France
7 Nov 201449.5AppointedBishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France
17 Jan 201549.7Ordained BishopBishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Philippe Paul Nault (VIAF: 166841067)
Bishop Jean-Philippe Paul Nault S.J.M.V. (born ) Bishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2014
  • c1: CB, 7 Nov 2014
  • ob: CB, 13 Nov 2014
  • c2+: CB, 11 Dec 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,351
  • fn: CB, 19 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 16 Sep 2018

Quantcast