Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri de Barillon

Deceased

Bishop of Luçon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1639BornParis
19 Jun 166627.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Oct 167132.6SelectedBishop of Luçon, France
8 Feb 167232.9ConfirmedBishop of Luçon, France
5 Jun 167233.2Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
6 May 169960.1DiedBishop of Luçon, France

MicroData Summary for Henri de Barillon:
Bishop Henri de Barillon (born , died ) Bishop of Luçon

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 249
  • c2+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 1 May 2015