Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis du Bouchet de Sourches

Deceased

Bishop of Dol


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1669¹BornParis
5 Jun 169425.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Apr 171546.3SelectedBishop of Dol, France
30 Mar 171647.2ConfirmedBishop of Dol, France
12 Jul 171647.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dol, France
12 Oct 171647.7InstalledBishop of Dol, France
23 Jun 174879.4DiedBishop of Dol, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis du Bouchet de Sourches:
Bishop Jean-Louis du Bouchet de Sourches (born 1669, died ) Bishop of Dol

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 186
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 4 Aug 2015