Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Foucquet

Deceased

Bishop of Agde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1633BornParis
31 Oct 165623.7SelectedBishop of Agde, France
28 May 165724.3ConfirmedBishop of Agde, France
2 Mar 165926.0Ordained BishopBishop of Agde, France
4 Feb 170269.0DiedBishop of Agde, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Foucquet:
Bishop Louis Foucquet (born , died ) Bishop of Agde

  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015