Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop René-Louis-Marie Stourm

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Sens (-Auxerre), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1904Born
17 Dec 192723.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
29 Jun 192824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
19 Jan 195146.8AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
2 Apr 195147.0Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
27 Oct 196258.6AppointedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
27 Jan 196358.8InstalledArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
28 Jun 197773.2RetiredArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
3 Nov 199086.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Sens (-Auxerre), France

MicroData Summary for René-Louis-Marie Stourm (VIAF: 36968525)
Archbishop René-Louis-Marie Stourm (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sens (-Auxerre)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceSens, Archdiocese of Sens (-Auxerre)
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Étienne, Cathedral, Sens, Archdiocese of Sens (-Auxerre)

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 23
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Jul 2018

Quantcast