Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques de Forbin-Janson

Deceased

Archbishop of Arles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1673BornParis
1 Jun 171138.1AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
2 Aug 171138.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Arles, France
17 Mar 171238.9InstalledArchbishop of Arles, France
14 Jan 174167.7DiedArchbishop of Arles, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques de Forbin-Janson:
Archbishop Jacques de Forbin-Janson (born , died ) Archbishop of Arles

  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015