Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Pierre Soubrier, P.S.S.

Bishop Emeritus of Nantes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1933 BornThérondels
29 Jun 196026.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
25 Jun 198854.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
25 Jun 198854.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Acholla
14 Oct 198854.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acholla
10 Oct 199662.9AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
8 Jul 200975.6RetiredBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Georges Pierre Soubrier:
Bishop Georges Pierre Soubrier P.S.S. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nantes

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nantes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,821
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Dec 2013